IMMIGRATION LAW PRACTITIONERS' ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ILPA is a professional association with 1000 members individuals and organisations practicing in all aspects of immigration, asylum and nationality law. ILPA's main aims are to promote and improve the advice and representation of immigrants, to disseminate information on developments in the law and to secure a just and equitable system of immigration, asylum and nationality law practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£729,493
Donations and legacies | £44.00k | |
Charitable activities | £668.74k | |
Other trading activities | £11.15k | |
Investments | £5.61k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£920,485
Raising funds | £2.89k | |
Charitable activities | £917.60k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.89k | |
Charitable expenditure | £917.60k |
People

9 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 January 2014: Standard registration
- ILPA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shaheen Mamun | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Speight | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Lewis | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Aisha Choudhry | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Goldfarb | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maria Gabriella Bettiga | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Als | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|||||
David Ball | Trustee | 23 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Barrett-Brown | Trustee | 23 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Moktadir | Trustee | 23 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Grace McGill | Trustee | 28 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ayesha Mohsin | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £712.45k | £552.16k | £648.14k | £692.52k | £729.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £724.06k | £531.19k | £561.64k | £718.61k | £920.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £15.00k | £18.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £60.00k | £240.25k | £42.51k | £44.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £15.50k | £13.99k | £19.43k | £14.75k | £11.15k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £695.83k | £476.24k | £387.79k | £633.52k | £668.74k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.13k | £1.94k | £676 | £1.75k | £5.61k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £724.06k | £531.19k | £523.54k | £677.11k | £917.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £38.10k | £41.50k | £2.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £41.14k | £35.36k | £0 | £58.67k | £35.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £135.12k | £92.91k | £0 | £100.84k | £245.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £55.49k | £44.39k | £31.43k | £17.63k | £25.72k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £807.58k | £803.31k | £911.71k | £1.01m | £739.85k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £121.10k | £84.76k | £93.70k | £207.65k | £133.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/02/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/11/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/12/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 NOV 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 NOV 2019 as amended on 23 Nov 2019 as amended on 24 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION AND TRAINING ON THE LAW AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE FIELDS OF IMMIGRATION, ASYLUM AND NATIONALITY LAW AND LEGAL ADVICE AND THE REPRESENTATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR MAY BECOME IMMIGRANTS TO ANY PART OF GREAT BRITAIN, NORTHERN IRELAND, THE CHANNEL ISLANDS AND THE ISLE OF MAN (TOGETHER "THE UNITED KINGDOM") FROM WHATEVER PART OF THE WORLD WHETHER COMING OR INTENDING TO COME TO THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR SETTLEMENT OR FOR SOME MORE LIMITED PURPOSE AND FOR IMMIGRANTS AND EMIGRANTS OF WHATEVER NATIONALITY TO OR FROM ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD. TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT I. HUMAN RIGHTS AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS, THE EUROPEAN CONVENTION ON HUMAN RIGHTS AND THE HUMAN RIGHTS ACT (1998), WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE RIGHTS TO ASYLUM, TO A NATIONALITY, TO FREEDOM OF MOVEMENT AND RESIDENCE AND NOT TO BE SUBJECT TO TORTURE OR TO SLAVERY; II. EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AS SET OUT IN THE EQUALITY ACT 2010 AND SIMILAR INSTRUMENTS AND INTERNATIONAL HUMAN RIGHTS TREATIES CONCERNED WITH THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION AND IN PARTICULAR WITH THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE OR SEX; IN PARTICULAR BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS • MONITORING ABUSES • RESEARCH INTO APPLICABLE LAW POLICY AND PRACTICE • EDUCATING THE PUBLIC • CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW • RAISING AWARENESS • PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT • PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS • PROMOTING RESPECT FOR THE RULE OF LAW WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE LAW PERTAINING TO IMMIGRATION, ASYLUM AND NATIONALITY • COORDINATING THE WORK OF IMMIGRATION, ASYLUM AND NATIONALITY LAW PRACTITIONERS
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o. SKS Ramon Lee
93 Tabernacle Street
London
- Phone:
- 02072518383
- Email:
- info@ilpa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window