ORGANISATION OF HUMAN WELFARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable activities to support development activities in Afghanistan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Islington
- Afghanistan
- Nepal
Governance
- 30 August 2012: Standard registration
- OHW (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FAHIM SADIQULLAH | Chair | 02 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
GHULAM SAKHI GULAN | Trustee | 02 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
RUKIYA AZIZI | Trustee | 02 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
VRINDA DAR | Trustee | 02 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 362 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 362 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 728 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 728 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 July 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 14 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE:- (A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN AFGHANISTAN AND ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, SAFE WATER, SANITATION, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; (B) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO) AFGHANISTAN IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY FACILITATING THE DELIVERY OF HIGH QUALITY EDUCATION, VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND CAPACITY DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMS AT ALL REQUIRED LEVELS; (C) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO AFGHANISTAN (I) IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; (II) CONDUCTING RESEARCH INTO ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL ISSUES; AND (III) ADVOCATING AND PRESENTING CONCERNS OF VULNERABLE AND MARGINALISED PEOPLE TO NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL POLICY MAKERS; (D) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF HUMANITARIAN AID (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO MEDICAL AID) TO SUCH PERSONS; (E) THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN AFGHANISTAN) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO LOCAL FARMERS REGARDING IMPROVED AGRICULTURAL TECHNIQUES AND NEW TECHNOLOGY TO IMPROVE THE LIVELIHOODS OF VULNERABLE FARMERS; (II) COMMUNITY LED NATURAL RESOURCE MANAGEMENT; (III) TRAINING INDIVIDUALS AND COMMUNITIES IN ALTERNATIVE LIVELIHOODS AND EMPLOYMENT; (IV) TRAINING COMMUNITIES IN RELATION TO GOVERNANCE; (V) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES: (VI) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT: AND (VII) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
AFGHANISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOUSE 8
STREET 6, DISTRICT 10
QALA E FATHULLAH
KABUL
AFGHANISTAN
- Phone:
- +93700278837
- Email:
- sfahim@ohw.org.af
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window