Financial history UGANDA LODGE COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity Number: 1150023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £79.76k £87.64k £96.04k £82.66k £91.30k
Total expenditure £70.53k £96.06k £97.25k £82.96k £88.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A