Financial history THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD LIVING GLORY COMMUNITY CHAPEL

Charity Number: 1148422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £9.90k £9.20k £8.80k £9.00k £9.50k
Total expenditure £9.80k £19.10k £19.00k £20.00k £27.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A