NOOR WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty, sickness, suffering, promoting health and well being of people in need in any part of the world. To promote the advancement of education and harmony without distinction of age, sex, race, political, religious or other opinion. Working through support of secular, religious, educational and training establishments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Greece
- Kenya
- Pakistan
Governance
- 03 October 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ISHRAT MEHDI | Chair | 28 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Edward John Cook | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHAKIL KHAN | Trustee | 28 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.53k | £4.58k | £9.38k | £4.15k | £1.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.22k | £9.99k | £11.44k | £2.67k | £3.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2021 | 332 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/04/2012 AS AMENDED ON 01/12/2015
Charitable objects
2.1 TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN THE TANA RIVER DISTRICT OF KENYA, AFRICA AND ITS ENVIRONS AND IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION, IN ASSOCIATION WITH STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, NON-GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATIONS OR INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROVIDE FOOD, CLEAN DRINKING WATER, CLOTHES, SHELTER, MEDICAL AID AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE. 2.1.1 TO SUPPORT AND EXPAND FACILITIES AT LOCAL MEDICAL CENTRES (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRES') TO COOPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH CENTRES FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. 2.1.2 TO PROMOTE RECONCILIATION/HARMONY BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT ETHNICITY, RACE, RELIGION OR OTHER OPINION BY SUPPORTING SECULAR AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS PROMOTING SUCH PURPOSES. 2.1.3 THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; (B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS'.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 SWALEDALE AVENUE
BURNLEY
BB10 2LJ
- Phone:
- 07595396709
- Email:
- noorwelfare@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window