Accounts and annual returns MIDWIVES@ETHIOPIA

Charity number: 1149831
Charity reporting is overdue by 760 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 760 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 760 days
Annual return 31 May 2021 08 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 19 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required