WEYMOUTH FAMILY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have been running services, courses, outreach, and several ministries around the town for nearly 21 years now. We are a member of the New Frontiers church movement and specifically the Commission group that is headed up by Guy Miller. We are also a member of the Evangelical Alliance and subscribe to their values and beliefs. We run a Sunday morning meeting and several mid week meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 07 November 2012: Standard registration
- THE EMMAUS ROAD (WEYMOUTH) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Bishop | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Richardson | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marianne McGowan | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.72k | £57.35k | £44.44k | £54.52k | £62.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.23k | £39.51k | £48.54k | £59.08k | £62.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
(1)TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS AS SPECIFIED BY THE EVANGELICAL ALLIANCE, IN WEYMOUTH AND SURROUNDING AREA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFILL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY, AND; (2)TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK OR WHO HAVE ADDICTION ISSUES AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN WEYMOUTH AND SURROUNDING AREA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bethany Hall
Westham Road
WEYMOUTH
DT4 8NP
- Phone:
- 01305313993
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window