Financial history ONSIDE MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1149686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £34.54k £15.03k £22.53k £30.66k £65.40k
Total expenditure £31.67k £16.52k £16.77k £32.11k £66.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A