Accounts and annual returns WEYMOUTH CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1148603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 19 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 08 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 08 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 10 September 2021 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 10 September 2021 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 17 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window