Financial history WEYMOUTH CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1148603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 31/03/2024
Total gross income £450.19k £356.03k £439.09k £505.03k £922.89k
Total expenditure £425.63k £351.88k £462.55k £440.52k £848.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £50.00k £20.00k £87.42k £57.18k £221.29k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £28.53k £17.43k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £475.12k £901.73k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.38k £3.73k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £4 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £440.18k £848.75k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £2.76k £5.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £340 £0