Accounts and annual returns KILBURN ISLAMIC CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1149705
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 September 2024 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 September 2024 215 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 31 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 31 March 2023 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 31 March 2023 365 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 07 May 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 07 May 2021 37 days late Download Open in new window