Financial history KILBURN ISLAMIC CENTRE LTD

Charity Number: 1149705
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £78.64k £70.87k £663.51k £376.19k £227.13k
Total expenditure £75.33k £71.00k £475.19k £420.24k £377.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £18.53k £6.89k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £663.51k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £475.19k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £332.33k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A