NANKESIDO EDUCATION AND WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities include: providing and assisting in the provision of facilities, educational materials and equipment for the schools in this area; the construction, maintenance and equipping of buildings and ground used for education; providing books, sports goods and kit, and other educational resources, either through direct purchase or by paying for transporting such items donated to the Charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ghana
Governance
- 08 August 2012: Standard registration
- NEWT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SEAN MURPHY BA | Chair | 31 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNAH MARY WATCHORN | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Clare Stanton Brown | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Davies | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Butler | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVE LEE | Trustee | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA COLLING | Trustee | 31 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.74k | £37.01k | £764 | £972 | £9.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.10k | £19.17k | £27.01k | £27.01k | £11.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 JUL 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NANKESIDO (LOWER SALTPOND) AND IN NEIGHBOURING AREAS WITHIN CENTRAL REGION, GHANA, THROUGH PRE-SCHOOL, PRIMARY, SECONDARY AND TERTIARY EDUCATION, WHERE NOT FULLY PROVIDED FOR BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, AND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING THE FOLLOWING: PROVIDING, AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES, EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS AND EQUIPMENT FOR THE SCHOOLS IN THESE PLACES, INCLUDING THE CONSTRUCTION, MAINTENANCE AND EQUIPPING OF BUILDINGS AND GROUNDS USED FOR EDUCATION; AND PROVIDING BOOKS, SPORTS GOODS AND KIT, AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES, EITHER THROUGH DIRECT PURCHASE OR BY PAYING FOR TRANSPORTING SUCH ITEMS DONATED TO THE TRUST; BY MAKING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS TO PAY FOR SCHOOL CLOTHING AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS; AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROVIDE OTHER FINANCIAL AND MATERIAL SUPPORT FOR THE WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITY OF NANKESIDO AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY, AND INCLUDING MAKING GRANTS FOR THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC HEALTH-CARE WHERE NOT PROVIDED BY STATUTORY BODIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 The Drive
Beckenham
BR3 1EE
- Phone:
- 02034905693
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window