Financial history STROKE RESEARCH AND COMMUNITY SUPPORT

Charity Number: 1149026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £117.53k £98.82k £135.59k £157.65k £160.97k
Total expenditure £141.98k £104.93k £129.52k £135.51k £134.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A