STROKE RESEARCH AND COMMUNITY SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity Shop City Centre Sheffield Charity Shop Knifesmithgate Chesterfield
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 20 September 2012: Standard registration
- STROKE ASSSOCIATION SUPPORT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCES MARGARET MAC-KENZIE MA PGCE | Chair | 07 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dale Charles Costigan | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Susan Green | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
GWILYM SION AP GRUFFUDD | Trustee | 07 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR TERENCE GODHARD | Trustee | 07 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANN GODHARD | Trustee | 07 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.53k | £98.82k | £135.59k | £157.65k | £160.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.98k | £104.93k | £129.52k | £135.51k | £134.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 February 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 February 2021 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATIONIN STROKES AND THEIRCAUSES EFFECTS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH IN RELATION TO THE FIELD OF STROKES AND TO CARE AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE IN STRKE SUVIVORS AND THOSE WHO MAY BE AT RISK OF HAVING A STROKE
Contact information
- Address:
-
116-118 The Moor
SHEFFIELD
S1 4PD
- Phone:
- 01142731400
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window