Accounts and annual returns CADLEY KIDS CLUB

Charity Number: 1149645
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 July 2024 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 12 July 2024 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 06 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 10 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 18 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 18 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window