Financial history THE GREAT BRITAIN - RUSSIA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1148802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £12.64k £11.71k £12.59k £12.32k £11.97k
Total expenditure £8.53k £9.71k £11.47k £12.32k £12.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A