Governing document HOLMES CHAPEL & DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1148879

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 15 JUN 2021 as amended on 13 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECT (‘THE OBJECT’) IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN HOLMES CHAPEL AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.