Trustees HOLMES CHAPEL & DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1148879

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Cassanadra McNeil | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Struselis | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Kathryn Thomas | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Winifred Anne Smith | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Elliott | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Elliott | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laurie L Yates | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marianne J Tomkinson | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Edward Savage | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Elaine Perrin | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.