YOUTH FOCUS WEST MIDLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity operates across the West Midlands providing support to local youth services to deliver direct services to young people in their communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £103,765 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 August 2012: Standard registration
- YFWM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Jane Grove | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JON BOAGEY | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Gillings | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Paul Finnemore | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
KERRY BARNES | Trustee | 06 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.34k | £114.29k | £127.69k | £129.40k | £119.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.35k | £45.73k | £101.48k | £95.29k | £88.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £57.42k | £59.40k | £68.91k | £80.42k | £103.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/06/2012
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PERSONAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO WORK WITH YOUNG PEOPLE 2) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Severn House
32 Ombersley Street West
DROITWICH
Worcestershire
WR9 8QZ
- Phone:
- 07791557907
- Email:
- info@yfwm.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window