Financial history MACCABI LONDON BRADY RECREATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1149701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £467.81k £936.33k £787.63k £498.83k £844.50k
Total expenditure £533.40k £438.90k £523.55k £637.01k £679.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.40k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £565.00k £392.33k N/A £365.30k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £72.79k £50.81k N/A £48.07k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £237.96k £344.48k N/A £422.55k
Income - Endowments N/A £1 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £48 £14 N/A £178
Income - Other N/A £60.53k £0 N/A £8.40k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £403.37k £458.90k N/A £641.16k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £32.62k £61.41k N/A £34.97k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £3.24k N/A £3.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £2.90k £3.24k N/A £3.85k