EVERLASTING MERCY CENTRE CHURCH

Charity Number: 1149749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Holding church activities and offering support to the General Public in the community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,265
Total expenditure: £960

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Sutton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 November 2012: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 29 September 2015: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Babatunde Soaga Trustee 10 June 2023
None on record
Kingsley Innocent Trustee 10 June 2023
None on record
Simbiso Mary Maswera Trustee 10 June 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.70k £950 £1.95k £1.45k £1.26k
Total expenditure £2.42k £700 £1.07k £1.06k £960
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
42a The Broadway
Cheam
SUTTON
SM3 8BD
Phone:
07961919277
Website:

No information available