Accounts and annual returns HELP FOR THE NEEDY UK FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1149151
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 17 November 2015 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 17 November 2015 17 days late
Annual return 31 December 2013 24 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 24 September 2014 On Time