FAITHFUL COMPANIONS OF JESUS EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity works with schools within the trusteeship of the Congregation of the Faithful Companions of Jesus (FCJ) to ensure that the schools operate in accordance with the teachings, tenets and practices of the Catholic Church and in accordance with the ethos reflecting the FCJ charism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sister Brigid Halligan FCJ | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SISTER JOSEPHINE YVONNE GRAINGER FCJ | Trustee | 17 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.00k | £8.02k | £40.03k | £50.00k | £49.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.67k | £1.60k | £38.50k | £52.90k | £48.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 DEC 2011
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: A) TO ADVANCE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING ACADEMIES UNDER THE DIRECTION OF THE CONGREGATION; B) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND THE EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE APPLICATION OF RESOURCES FOR SUCH PURPOSES INCLUDING, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, BY PROMOTING AND DISSEMINATING MODELS OF GOOD PRACTICE AND BY THE DELIVERY OF SUPPORT SERVICES GENERALLY TO SUCH INSTITUTIONS; AND C) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT, IF AT ANY TIME THE CONGREGATION SHALL CEASE TO EXIST OR SHALL CEASE TO CARRY ON RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE WORK, THEN THE TRUSTEES MAY ADVANCE SUCH OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Aloysius Convent
32 Phoenix Road
LONDON
NW1 1TA
- Phone:
- 02034358049
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window