THE FRIENDS OF HEALTH CARE IN BUILTH WELLS AND DISTRICT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Health Care activities in the Builth Wells area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Powys
Governance
- 02 February 1974: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF BUILTH WELLS COTTAGE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BUILTH WELLS COTTAGE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSALIND NUTTING | Trustee | 20 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ISAAC ALUN JONES | Trustee | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET LYDIA EVANS | Trustee | 01 February 2012 |
|
|||||
Suzanne Jones | Trustee | 01 February 2012 |
|
|||||
AUDREY JONES | Trustee | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY SYSARINE KINSEY | Trustee | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
EVA MARLENE DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA ROSEMARY JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA GLADYS MAUD SAMUEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP JOHN MORRIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
IAIN DUNDAS BROWN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS JOYCE DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS LIZ WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JUNE PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID THOMAS NORTHEY RONICLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUBY MARGARET BAGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.03k | £5.39k | £10.05k | £5.96k | £6.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.33k | £13.49k | £8.23k | £5.75k | £22.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/02/1973 AS AMENDED ON 13/01/1998 AS AMENDED ON 26/05/1998 AS AMENDED ON 19/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE FRIENDS SHALL BE TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS RESIDENT IN THE DISTRICT WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WITHIN THE DISTRICT. THE FRIENDS MAY MAKE GRANTS TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE FOR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SERVICES WITHIN OR SERVED BY THE DISTRICT, REGISTERED CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS-(WHICH ARE CHARITIES) WORKING IN HEALTH CARE WITHIN THE DISTRICT BUT INDIVIDUAL AND PRIVATE NON CHARITABLE COMPANIES ARE EXCLUDED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Garth Road
Builth Wells
LD2 3AR
- Phone:
- 01982553068
- Email:
- iaindbrown@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window