Accounts and annual returns Radio City 1386AM - The Swansea Bay UHB Hospital Radio Service

Charity number: 503061
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 08 April 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 13 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 22 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required