Trustees ACE (ACTION IN CAERAU AND ELY)
Charity number: 1150422

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marian Dixey | Chair | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Davies | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Omobonike Atobatele | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janice Refalo | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eva Elliot | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lannen | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leyton Devril Smith | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Roach | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oonagh Mary Scott | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Melvin Witherden | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.