FOOTBALL UNITES RACISM DIVIDES EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charitable company are to promote equality of opportunity and good relations between people of different racial groups, especially within the area of benefit, particularly through the medium of football and other amateur sports, recreational or leisure-time activities. The organisational activities of the FURD Trust are gradually being migrated across to the charitable company.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £38,874 from 7 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 03 October 2012: Standard registration
- FURD (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HOWARD JOHN HOLMES | Chair | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Maroof Raouf Cllr | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Amy Hood | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Julie Callaghan | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Muetesim Ahmed | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Ayesha Khan | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Derek Bell | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Jonathan Paul Roberts | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
VICTOR MUJAKACHI | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Saudat Adinani | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Simon Brook | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
FARHAAN GULFRAZ | Trustee | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
KEVIN PETER TITTERTON | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £396.23k | £316.02k | £390.37k | £277.00k | £369.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240.83k | £243.78k | £294.95k | £265.35k | £304.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.37k | £103.09k | £115.61k | £26.00k | £38.87k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 29 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 AUG 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PEOPLE OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS, ESPECIALLY WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF FOOTBALL AND THROUGH OTHER AMATEUR SPORTS AND RECREATIONAL OR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES. THIS WILL BE ACHIEVED BY 3.2.1 THE PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF ANTI-RACIST EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 26 3.2.2 INCREASING THE ACTIVE PARTICIPATION OF ETHNIC MINORITIES WITHIN ALL ASPECTS OF AMATEUR SPORT AND OTHER RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES INTENDED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3.2.3 SECURING A SAFE ENVIRONMENT FOR PEOPLE FROM ALL COMMUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN AMATEUR SPORTS AND OTHER RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
U Mix
U Mix Building
17 Asline Road
Lowfields
SHEFFIELD
- Phone:
- 01142587787
- Email:
- enquiries@furd.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window