PETER HARRISON HERITAGE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At the discretion of the trustees the charity supports activities and projects which are well planned, likely to have a sustainable impact and deliver wide public benefit. Grants are expected to make a substantial difference to benefiting projects and charities. The charity is not open to applications for grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 September 2012: Standard registration
- 20 December 2022: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.13k | £21.53k | £19.86k | £18.32k | £4.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £788.80k | £207.89k | £88.02k | £212.52k | £177.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/02/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window