SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE HEART FAILURE, EDUCATION AND CARDIAC REHABILITATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising - Mayors Charity for Stratford upon Avon, Mayors Charity for Warwick, Sainsbury's Charity - Leamington Spa Recent Events - CharityBall.org, Celebration Ball, Alcester All Male Voice Choir, Rowathon and show Stratford College Activity to date - Partnership pilot phase 3 rehab in Leamington, part funding of Heart Failure Specialist nurses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 28 September 2012: Standard registration
- SW-HEART (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR N QURESHI | Chair | 20 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR BILL COWLES | Trustee | 20 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Sister DONNA MCDONNELL BSc | Trustee | 20 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.69k | £73 | £31 | £144 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £505 | £663 | £526 | £591 | £605 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 March 2025 | 411 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 March 2025 | 776 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 March 2025 | 1141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 August 2022 | 559 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27/09/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) RAISING FUNDING FOR CARDIAC SPECIALIST NURSES AND ALLIED STAFF TO PROVIDE FOR AN INTEGRATED CARDIAC REHABILITATION AND HEART FAILURE SERVICE IN SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE FOR ALL HEART PATIENTS WHO WOULD BENEFIT FROM THIS SERVICE. (B) ESTABLISHING A COMMUNITY BASED CARDIAC REHABILITATION SERVICE FOR ALL HEART PATIENTS WHO WOULD BENEFIT FROM THIS SPECIALIST INPUT. (C) ESTABLISHING A COMMUNITY BASED HEART FAILURE SERVICE TO SUPPORT THE NEEDS OF HEART FAILURE PATIENTS FROM TIME OF DIAGNOSIS TILL END OF LIFE CARE. (D) WORKING CLOSELY WITH THE SECONDARY, PRIMARY AND COMMUNITY CARE SERVICES TO ENSURE THAT ALL HEART PATIENTS HAVE A SEAMLESS SUPPORT SERVICE FOR THE ABOVE. (E) PROVIDING AN EDUCATIONAL FORUM FOR BOTH HEART PATIENTS, AND PEOPLE AFFECTED BY HEART DISEASE REGARDING HEART RELATED ISSUES. (F) WORKING CLOSELY WITH OTHER HEART CHARITIES IN INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS AND EDUCATION ON PRIMARY AND SECONDARY PREVENTION OF HEART DISEASE. (G) PROMOTING AND INFLUENCING EFFECTIVE CARE, INVOLVEMENT AND SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE AFFECTED BY HEART DISEASE IN SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE. (H) DEVELOPING, DELIVERING AND PROMOTING SERVICES THAT PROVIDE SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE, INFORMATION AND REHABILITATION OF HEART PATIENTS. (I) DEVELOPING DELIVERING AND PROMOTING SERVICES THAT PROVIDE SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE, INFORMATION, TREATMENT AND CARE FOR PEOPLE AFFECTED BY HEART FAILURE. (J) DEVELOPING AND PROMOTING SERVICES AND LOCAL POLICY THAT IMPROVE PALLIATIVE AND END-OF-LIFE CARE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE AFFECTED BY ADVANCED HEART FAILURE. IN THESE OBJECTS 'PEOPLE AFFECTED BY HEART DISEASE' INCLUDES INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE A SUSPECTED OR CONFIRMED DIAGNOSIS, THEIR CARERS, FAMILIES, FRIENDS OR ANYONE ELSE DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY AFFECTED BY THE CONDITION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 JURY STREET
WARWICK
CV34 4EH
- Phone:
- 07767 660832
- Email:
- info@sw-heart.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window