Accounts and annual returns SMILING WORLD FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1150151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 June 2024 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 15 June 2023 03 August 2024 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 15 June 2022 08 August 2023 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 15 June 2021 08 August 2023 480 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 15 June 2020 08 August 2023 845 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 June 2020 Not Required