LITTLEFIELD FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the company is to make grants to benefit education, the environment and children. The charity is organised so that the Trustees hold at least two ordinary meetings in each year. The trustees decide on the grants to be made within the scope of the Charity?s objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 10 September 2012: Standard registration
- 23 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to be charitable)
- LITTLEFIELD FOUNDATION (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.23m | £12.60k | £8.52k | £13.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.49k | £130.12k | £144.19k | £133.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.23m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £5.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 21 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 24 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 22 September 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 AUG 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window