Accounts and annual returns THE TSUKANOV FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1148772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 October 2023 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 August 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 October 2021 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 October 2021 463 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required