LONDON CHINESE LUTHERAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LCLC is a spiritual home away from home for the Chinese community in London. It has weekly Sunday Christian Lutheran worship service conducted in Cantonese & Mandarin (English on first week of every month). Its members come from Hong Kong, China, Malaysia, Singapore, Taiwan and United Kingdom. LCLC is a member of Lutheran Church in Great Britain which is a member of the Lutheran World Federation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
Governance
- 25 January 2013: Standard registration
- LCLC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jimmy Linggang WANG | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sau Yee YIP | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mee kee KONG | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edgar Kar CHAN | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.41k | £17.68k | £18.00k | £25.71k | £39.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.69k | £8.47k | £13.46k | £27.62k | £31.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2024 | 177 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF LCLC IS TO PROVIDE A PLATFORM FOR THE LUTHERAN CHRISTIANS TO CONGREGATE AND COMMUNICATE THEIR FAITH AND SPIRITUALITY IN CHINESE AND TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION - LUTHERANISM -AMONG MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN LONDON THROUGH TEACHING AND WORSHIPPING TOGETHER WITH THE YOUNG AND THE AGED REGARDLESS OF WHERE THEY COME FROM.LCLC AIMS TO PROVIDE A SPIRITUAL HOME AWAY FROM HOME FOR THOSE WHO RESIDE IN LONDON ON A TEMPORARY BASIS SUCH AS STUDY OR WORK AND THROUGH THE SPIRITUAL HOME AND WITHIN THE LIMIT OF THE CONGREGATION'S FINANCIAL CAPACITY LCLC WILL PROVIDE APPROPRIATE SUPPORT TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND HARDSHIP AND TO PRESERVE SPIRITUAL AND PHYSICAL GOOD HEALTH AND WELL BEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
London Chinese Lutheran Church
c/o American International Church
79A Tottenham Court Road
LONDON
W1T 4TD
- Phone:
- 07734051601
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window