MANCHESTER CHARITABLE TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLETE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Salford City
Governance
- 06 September 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YEHOSHUA YOSEF FULDA | Trustee | 06 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Irving Michael Shapiro | Trustee | 06 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Neumann | Trustee | 06 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Frankel | Trustee | 06 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
LEAH PEARL GROSS | Trustee | 15 August 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.84k | £99.16k | £56.85k | £107.45k | £88.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.52k | £87.88k | £81.35k | £90.34k | £52.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2024
(These accounts |
05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/09/2012
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING: GRANTS OR LOANS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 Park Road
Prestwich
MANCHESTER
M25 0EA
- Phone:
- 01618328721
- Email:
- martin.gross@lopiangb.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window