OSGOLDCROSS FORUM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Projects. Community Transport. Youth Provision
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Wakefield
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 22 October 2012: Standard registration
- 25 January 2017: Funds received from 1116330 THE OSGOLDCROSS FORUM
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David NICKLIN | Chair | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ERIC BEECHEY | Trustee | 31 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.15k | £157.79k | £65.63k | £128.12k | £122.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.38k | £111.27k | £116.23k | £117.32k | £95.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 December 2022 | 308 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/03/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/10/2012
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO PROMOTE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF OSGOLDCROSS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS OF YORKSHIRE (‘THE AREA OF BENEFIT’) BY: A. THE PROVISION OF RELIEF FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE B. ADVANCING EDUCATION AND HEALTH OF ITS RESIDENTS OF ALL AGES C. PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE AFOREMENTIONED RESIDENTS TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN THE LIFE OF THEIR COMMUNITY IN WAYS WHICH ADDRESS AND ALLEVIATE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE. 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 8 Ferrybridge Business Park
Fishergate
Knottingley
West Yorkshire
WF11 8NA
- Phone:
- 01977607242
- Email:
- INFO@OSGF.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window