RAISE THE CHILDREN INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of funding to organisations in South Africa and Africa dealing with disadvantaged children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- South Africa
Governance
- 04 October 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL HOLZAPFEL | Chair | 11 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ipek Celine Martha De vilder | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
DUNSTAN LWENDO KAMANA | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
LORD MICHAEL HASTINGS | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £3.36k | £7.22k | £5.50k | £32.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £296 | £960 | £960 | £11.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY,SICKNESS,THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST ORPHANED AND VULNERABLE CHILDREN IN AFRICA,IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 SUNDRIDGE AVENUE
BROMLEY
BR1 2QP
- Phone:
- 02082905733
- Email:
- admin@raisethechildren.org
- Website:
-
raisethechildren.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window