MERSEYSIDE PARTNERS IN POLICYMAKING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, AND THE PARENTS OF DISABLED CHILDREN AND DISABLED SELF-ADVOCATES IN PARTICULAR, ON ISSUES RELATING TO DISABILITY. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 07 February 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katarzyna Reszel | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Leigh | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.77k | £53.46k | £39.96k | £27.64k | £3.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.62k | £34.23k | £43.84k | £45.77k | £17.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £23.77k | £53.46k | £28.57k | £19.41k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £11.39k | £8.24k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/04/2002 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/02/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, AND THE PARENTS OF DISABLED CHILDREN AND DISABLED SELF-ADVOCATES IN PARTICULAR, ON ISSUES RELATING TO DISABILITY. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED MEANS CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES, THEIR PARENTS, AND DISABLED SELF-ADVOCATES.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LANCASTER CENTRE
170 RICE LANE
LIVERPOOL
L9 1DG
- Phone:
- 01512877977
- Email:
- mpip@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window