Financial history NATIONAL HEREDITARY BREAST CANCER HELPLINE

Charity Number: 1150183
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £387.04k £429.61k £340.63k £324.85k £374.65k
Total expenditure £441.97k £272.31k £323.15k £342.89k £376.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £288.97k £47.34k N/A N/A