NATIONAL HEREDITARY BREAST CANCER HELPLINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating, organising , managing and promoting an association for the training and/or education and or general advice into all areas of hereditary breast cancer In order to achieve this objective the charity has opened charity shops which also act as community support and information centres providing support to patients and families
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 December 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Jill Watson MBE | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Victor Squires | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Grant Anderson | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £387.04k | £429.61k | £340.63k | £324.85k | £374.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £441.97k | £272.31k | £323.15k | £342.89k | £376.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £288.97k | £47.34k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
31 March 2025 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/12/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:- 1)OPERATE, ORGANISE, MANAGE AND PROMOTE AN ASSOCIATION FOR THE TRAINING AND / OR EDUCATION AND / OR GENERAL ADVICE INTO ALL AREAS OF HEREDITARY BREAST CANCER; 2)TO MANAGE A NATIONAL HELPLINE FOR THE DELIVERY OF ADVICE ABOUT HEREDITARY BREAST CANCER; AND 3)TO HELP AND SUPPORT ANYONE CONCERNED ABOUT THEIR INCREASED RISK OF DEVELOPING BREAST CANCER DUE TO FAMILY HISTORY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
N H B C H Warehouse
71 Storforth Lane Trading Estate
Hasland
CHESTERFIELD
S41 0QZ
- Phone:
- 01629813000
- Email:
- nhbchtrustees@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window