THE MUSICAL THEATRE ACADEMY LONDON

Charity Number: 1148894
Charity is insolvent

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A) THE EDUCATION THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS, AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS, WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF MUSICAL THEATRE. B) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 September 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Harry Blumenau Trustee 09 October 2019
None on record
Jonathan Harris Trustee 12 November 2018
None on record
ANNEMARIE LEWIS THOMAS Trustee 16 August 2012
None on record
SAMANTHA KATHLEEN HULL Trustee 16 August 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £642.21k £545.99k £597.53k £684.55k £511.78k
Total expenditure £625.75k £535.48k £575.36k £582.85k £442.86k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.49k £215 £1.80k £6.76k £37.29k
Income - Other trading activities £8.27k £19.15k £22.12k £22.99k £0
Income - Charitable activities £630.43k £526.60k £573.41k £647.44k £469.38k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £20 £28 £206 £206 £9
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £7.15k £5.10k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £625.75k £535.48k £575.36k £582.85k £442.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.22k £0 £3.18k £3.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Own use assets £66.19k £56.76k £48.42k £39.12k £38.43k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £164.29k £252.96k £283.29k £384.70k £353.18k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £349.29k £418.01k £417.82k £408.24k £307.11k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023
Annual return 31 August 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022
Annual return 31 August 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021
Annual return 31 August 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020
Annual return 31 August 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE MTA, Bernie Grant Arts Centre
Enterprise Building
Town Hall Approach Road
Tottenham
LONDON
N15 4RX
Phone:
02088856543