Accounts and annual returns ANAYA AID

Charity Number: 1152971
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 31 January 2025 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 28 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 28 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 28 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 28 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 29 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 29 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 29 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 29 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window