Trustees ARTIS COMMUNITY/CYMUNED LTD
Charity Number: 1150201

Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Esther Morris | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Stephen Garrett | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Newby | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Caroline Wilson | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Clare Hudson | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHARLES PITTICK | Trustee | 11 September 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.