Accounts and annual returns HARBOUR CHALLENGE OEC LIMITED

Charity number: 1148647
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2017 03 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 May 2018 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2016 17 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 17 July 2017 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2015 27 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 26 July 2016 On Time