HARBOUR CHALLENGE OEC LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and to provide people of all ages from disadvantaged and disabled backgrounds the opportunity to participate in outdoor and sporting activities through the provision of low cost programmes, courses and bursaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 August 2012: Standard registration
- 26 January 2015: Funds received from 1103870 HARBOUR CHALLENGE
- 07 September 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HARBOUR CHALLENGE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.27k | £317.50k | £335.97k | £340.48k | £413.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.80k | £232.34k | £327.05k | £395.07k | £416.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £4.50k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 03 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2017
(These accounts |
03 May 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 17 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | 17 July 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 27 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | 26 July 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE PEOPLE OF ALL AGES FROM DISADVANTAGED AND DISABLED BACKGROUNDS THE OPPORTUNITY TO PARTICIPATE IN OUTDOOR AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LOW COST PROGRAMS, COURSES AND BURSARIES 2) TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES IN ORDER TO HELP THEM TOWARDS ACHIEVING THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND TO MAXIMISE THEIR OPPORTUNITIES IN LIFE GENERALLY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window