AID INDIA DIRECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(A)THE ADVANCEMENT EDUCATION IN INDIA (B)THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN INDIA BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, (C)PREVENTION OF SICKNESS AND IMPROVEMENT OF HEALTH IN INDIA (D)THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND OF SUFFERING VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER (E)ANY OTHER PURPOSES RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE PURPOSES UNDER EXISTING CHARITY LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Barking And Dagenham
- Birmingham City
- Sandwell
- Slough
- India
Governance
- 26 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAGWINDER SINGH KANG | Trustee | 07 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUKHVINDER SINGH RAJU BSC | Trustee | 07 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
KALWANT DHESI | Trustee | 07 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.20k | £19.01k | £7.37k | £6.30k | £12.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.10k | £3.18k | £16.72k | £3.23k | £17.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS). (A)THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN INDIA BY PROVIDING ADVICE, FACILITIES, BOOKS, EQUIPMENT AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES; (B)THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN INDIA BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; (C)PREVENTION OF SICKNESS AND IMPROVEMENT OF HEALTH IN INDIA BY PAYING FOR AND/OR PROVIDING ACCESS TO NECESSARY AND LIFE CHANGING HEALTHCARE TO INDIVIDUALS AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT SICKNESS AND IMPROVE HEALTH; (D)THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND OF SUFFERING OF VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER OR OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, GENDER, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN INDIA BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, ITEMS AND SERVICES AND HEALTHCARE TO INDIVIDUALS AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT SUFFERING; AND (E)ANY OTHER PURPOSES RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE PURPOSES UNDER EXISTING CHARITY LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 TEMPLAR CLOSE
STENSON FIELDS
DERBY
DE24 3EL
- Phone:
- 07939625777
- Email:
- jagkang16@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window