THE BERNICE COWEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve sickness & for the protection of health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 September 2012: Standard registration
- THE BERNICE COWEN FUND (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN COWEN | Chair | 20 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN LEIGH | Trustee | 20 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.13k | £14.91k | £24.45k | £37.90k | £21.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.22k | £33.34k | £9.69k | £23.61k | £46.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 AUG 2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS & THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH & IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN PROMOTING THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL & SURGICAL STUDIES & RESEARCH & IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING)STUDY & RESEARCH IN THE PREVENTION, TREATMENT & CURE OF BOWEL RELATED CANCERS & IN ALL OTHER BRANCHES OF ONCOLOGY, TO THE INTENT THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY & RESEARCH BE DISSEMINATED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Holbrook Gardens
Aldenham
WATFORD
WD258AB
- Phone:
- 07860544228
- Email:
- michaelalerner@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window