Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS GUILDFORD
Charity number: 1149709

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Beverly Anne Watson | Chair | 03 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Evelynne Gunn | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Alister Jones | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Knott | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Robson-Bravery | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Margaret Nicholls | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carys Lodge | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN BERTRAM WHITEMAN | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Patrick Malcolm Payne | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Heather Crombie Moulden | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Neil Wells | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Margaret Stevenson Care Hopwood | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Twidell | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Lodge | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN LANCELOT LIONEL HOLDSWORTH | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ELIZABETH TYE | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr SIMON JOHN DORAN | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Harding | Trustee | 17 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.