CP MINISTRIES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CP Ministries UK works with disadvantages emigrants families with low income resources. The company assists children, young and adults by offering different educational programs such us family conflicts and resolution, anti-social behavior, specific youth projects, academic support. The educational programs are based on Christian principles and values.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 December 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LESLY ANTELO | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Padilla | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £8.87k | £4.75k | £2.43k | £2.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £3.79k | £14.28k | £2.46k | £1.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 07 October 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/11/2011
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY TEACHING, PREACHING AND PROPAGATING THE DOCTRINES, PRINCIPLE BELIEFS, AND TEACHING OF GOD AND OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BIBLE TO (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE SPANISH COMMUNITY IN LONDON. (B) TO ADVANCE ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
147 Whyteleafe Road
CATERHAM
Surrey
CR3 5EJ
- Phone:
- 07990032416
- Email:
- milpadilla77@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window