LOL-FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aims: (a) the provision of accommodation to those who are homeless; (b) the provision of counselling; (c) the provision of work based training and education to those who are unemployed; (d) the provision of advice and guidance to assist those who are unemployed to find suitable employment. We are based in Cheshire but take homeless veterans from all over the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Total income includes £40,000 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 03 October 2012: Standard registration
- 16 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.06k | £170.21k | £143.45k | £137.67k | £159.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.45k | £170.06k | £157.41k | £131.58k | £185.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £40.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £134.83k | £134.70k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 292 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 292 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 August 2024 | 388 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2022
(These accounts |
21 August 2024 | 388 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/09/2012
Charitable objects
TO REDUCE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONGST FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES OR THOSE WHO ARE ABOUT TO LEAVE THE SERVICES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION TO THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS; (B) THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING; (C) THE PROVISION OF WORK BASED TRAINING AND EDUCATION TO THOSE WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED; (D) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND GUIDANCE TO ASSIST THOSE WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED TO FIND SUITABLE EMPLOYMENT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window